Brandner, Otto
Occupation: | Bookseller |
---|---|
Corporate Relations: | Fedor Pohl (Amberg): Lehrling und Gehilfe 01.06.1855-08.10.1860 August Schröter (Plauen): Gehilfe 21.11.1860-22.02.1862 Buchner'sche Buchhandlung (Bamberg): Gehilfe 03.1862-15.04.1863 Missionsbuchhandlung (Basel): Mitarbeiter 07.1863-08.1867 Justus Naumann's Buchhandlung (Dresden): Gehilfe 20.03.-29.08.1868 Langenscheidt'sche Verlagsbuchhandlung (Berlin): Mitarbeiter 01.09.1868-20.02.1869 Otto Brandner. Filiale Ducherow (Firma): Eigentümer 01.05.1869- |
Geographical Relations: | Location of work: Amberg Location of work: Plauen Location of work: Bamberg Location of work: Basel Location of work: Dresden Location of work: Berlin Location of work: Ducherow Place of birth: Berg bei Hof Country: Germany (XA-DE) |
Biographical References: | GND (1073435512) |
Subsystems: | Index Theologicus |
Newest Titles (by)
- Achtzehn Jahre in Uganda und Ostafrika / Bd. 1
- Achtzehn Jahre in Uganda und Ostafrika / Bd. 2
- Achtzehn Jahre in Uganda und Ostafrika
Related Authors
Popular keywords
Publication Timeline
Details
-
MARC
LEADER | 00000cz a2200000n 4500 | ||
---|---|---|---|
001 | 829506284 | ||
003 | DE-627 | ||
005 | 20230724212028.0 | ||
008 | 150710n||aznnnabbn | aaa |c | ||
024 | 7 | |a http://d-nb.info/gnd/1073435512 |2 uri | |
035 | |a (DE-588)1073435512 | ||
035 | |a (DE-627)829506284 | ||
035 | |a (DE-576)435041584 | ||
043 | |c XA-DE | ||
079 | |a g |b p |c v |q d |v piz | ||
100 | 1 | |a Brandner, Otto | |
375 | |a 1 |2 iso5218 | ||
510 | 2 | |0 (DE-627)828976988 |0 (DE-576)434397555 |0 (DE-588)1073004074 |a Fedor Pohl |g Amberg |4 affi |w r |i Affiliation |e Affiliation |9 v:Lehrling und Gehilfe |9 Z:01.06.1855-08.10.1860 | |
510 | 2 | |0 (DE-627)828988692 |0 (DE-576)434383333 |0 (DE-588)1073018547 |a August Schröter |g Plauen |4 affi |w r |i Affiliation |e Affiliation |9 v:Gehilfe |9 Z:21.11.1860-22.02.1862 | |
510 | 2 | |0 (DE-627)828944385 |0 (DE-576)434436682 |0 (DE-588)1072963337 |a Buchner'sche Buchhandlung |g Bamberg |4 affi |w r |i Affiliation |e Affiliation |9 v:Gehilfe |9 Z:03.1862-15.04.1863 | |
510 | 2 | |0 (DE-627)828904340 |0 (DE-576)434484725 |0 (DE-588)1072914859 |a Missionsbuchhandlung |g Basel |4 affi |w r |i Affiliation |e Affiliation |9 v:Mitarbeiter |9 Z:07.1863-08.1867 | |
510 | 2 | |0 (DE-627)828971749 |0 (DE-576)434403296 |0 (DE-588)1072998009 |a Justus Naumann's Buchhandlung |g Dresden |4 affi |w r |i Affiliation |e Affiliation |9 v:Gehilfe |9 Z:20.03.-29.08.1868 | |
510 | 2 | |0 (DE-627)300068190 |0 (DE-576)197756646 |0 (DE-588)5332800-0 |a Langenscheidt'sche Verlagsbuchhandlung |g Berlin |4 affi |w r |i Affiliation |e Affiliation |9 v:Mitarbeiter |9 Z:01.09.1868-20.02.1869 | |
510 | 2 | |0 (DE-627)828921172 |0 (DE-576)434464406 |0 (DE-588)107293535X |a Otto Brandner |g Firma |b Filiale Ducherow |4 affi |w r |i Affiliation |e Affiliation |9 v:Eigentümer |9 Z:01.05.1869- | |
548 | |a 1869 |4 datw |w r |i Wirkungsdaten | ||
550 | |0 (DE-627)105698660 |0 (DE-576)209623330 |0 (DE-588)4130948-0 |a Buchhändler |4 berc |w r |i Charakteristischer Beruf | ||
551 | |0 (DE-627)106396382 |0 (DE-576)208843655 |0 (DE-588)4001632-8 |a Amberg |4 ortw |w r |i Wirkungsort |9 Z:01.06.1855-08.10.1860 | ||
551 | |0 (DE-627)104744553 |0 (DE-576)209069066 |0 (DE-588)4046334-5 |a Plauen |4 ortw |w r |i Wirkungsort |9 Z:21.11.1860-22.02.1862 | ||
551 | |0 (DE-627)106386069 |0 (DE-576)208855688 |0 (DE-588)4004391-5 |a Bamberg |4 ortw |w r |i Wirkungsort |9 Z:03.1862-15.04.1863 | ||
551 | |0 (DE-627)10638497X |0 (DE-576)208856919 |0 (DE-588)4004617-5 |a Basel |4 ortw |w r |i Wirkungsort |9 Z:07.1863-08.1867 | ||
551 | |0 (DE-627)106345745 |0 (DE-576)20890140X |0 (DE-588)4012995-0 |a Dresden |4 ortw |w r |i Wirkungsort |9 Z:20.03.-29.08.1868 | ||
551 | |0 (DE-627)10482638X |0 (DE-576)208862560 |0 (DE-588)4005728-8 |a Berlin |4 ortw |w r |i Wirkungsort |9 Z:01.09.1868-20.02.1869 | ||
551 | |0 (DE-627)490213340 |0 (DE-576)216992079 |0 (DE-588)4830829-8 |a Ducherow |4 ortw |w r |i Wirkungsort |9 Z:01.05.1869- | ||
551 | |a Berg bei Hof |4 ortg |w r |i Geburtsort | ||
678 | |b Inhaber von: Otto Brandner <Stettin> (Id: k2525) (-31.03.1889). - Quelle: B1440a | ||
ORI | |a TA-MARC-ixtheoc001.raw | ||
SUB | |a IXT |b 3 | ||
SUB | |a REL |b 2 | ||
TIT | |a ixtheo |a relbib |